IL SB2387 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-07 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Trust and Payable on Death Accounts Act. Makes a technical change to the short title Section.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOID-DISPOSITION-AFFIDAVIT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-11-07HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2018-05-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-25HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-24HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-05-24HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-24HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018
2018-05-18HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-05-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-17HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-16HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-16HouseArrived in House
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2018-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 042-010-001
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Morrison
2018-05-16SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 007-003-000
2018-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2018
2018-05-08SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-08SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 11, 2018
2018-05-03SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-03SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-05-02SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-04-25SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-04-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018
2018-04-12SenateSecond Reading
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018
2018-03-01SenateDo Pass Executive; 009-000-000
2018-02-06SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-01-24SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-24SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-24SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2056251Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback