IL SB2378 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0970
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0970
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Community Self-Revitalization Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
POLICE AND COMMUNITY RELATIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-19 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0970 |
2018-08-19 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-19 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Raoul |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 350 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |