IL SB2365 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department on Aging for its FY12 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2011.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DEPARTMENT ON AGING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 30 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08SenateSession Sine Die
2012-06-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2012-06-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-06-27HouseFirst Reading
2012-05-31HousePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2012-05-31HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan
2012-05-31HouseArrived in House
2012-05-31SenateThird Reading - Passed; 030-025-004
2012-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2012-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Trotter
2012-05-31SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2012-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2012-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2012-05-31SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2012-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2012
2012-03-30SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2011-07-23SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2011-04-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011
2011-04-08SenateSecond Reading
2011-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 31, 2011
2011-03-30SenateDo Pass Appropriations I; 007-005-000
2011-03-03SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2011-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2011-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2011-02-15SenateChief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan
2011-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback