IL SB2362 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1047
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-4)
Status: Passed on August 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1047
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
PROCUREMENT-LEASE-PROPERTY-UIC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1047 |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 054-000-001 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 014-000-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000 |
2018-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-25 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2018-05-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-05-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-05-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-000-001 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harmon |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 012-000-001 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |