IL SB2362 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 038-078-000
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 038-078-000
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
HERPTILES-HERPS ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 38 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 038-078-000 |
2013-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-05-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 011-004-000 |
2013-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2013-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-04-30 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2013 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Clayborne |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture and Conservation; 007-000-001 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Agriculture and Conservation |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |