IL SB2360 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0553
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Banking Emergencies Act. In provisions concerning powers of the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation, provides that following a proclamation by the Secretary that authorizes banks to close or alter the hours at any or all of the bank offices due to an emergency, the officers of the bank may, at an earlier time than a proclamation by the Secretary that the emergency or impending emergency has ended, determine that the closed office or offices should reopen and the amount of time reasonably necessary to reopen. Provides that the officers of a bank shall have the authority to determine not to open any of the bank's offices or to close an office if an emergency exists, or is impending, which affects or may affect the bank's offices, even if the Secretary does not issue a proclamation. Provides that the office closed shall remain closed until the time that the officers determine the emergency has ended, and for the further amount of time reasonably necessary to reopen. Provides that no bank office shall remain closed for more than 48 consecutive hours. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may adopt rules to address the closing or alteration of hours by banks at one or more of their offices when affected by an emergency or impending emergency. Makes other changes.
Title
BANKING EMERGENCY ACT-HOLIDAYS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0553 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-05-26 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Financial Institutions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-04-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Financial Institutions; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Financial Institutions |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John Connor |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 610 | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
205 | 610 | 3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
205 | 610 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 610 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |