IL SB2352 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on August 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1032
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Long Term Care Rebalancing Note Act. Provides that every bill, except those bills making a direct appropriation, the purpose or effect of which is (i) to expend any State funds for long term care services or (ii) to expend any State funds for community or home-based alternatives to long term care services, shall have prepared for it prior to second reading in the house of introduction a brief explanatory statement or note which shall include a reliable estimate of the anticipated change in State funding or revenues under its provisions. Provides that for purposes of the Act, revenues include, but are not limited to, changes to revenue received from Federal Medical Assistance Percentage (FMAP). Contains provisions concerning preparation of the note; confidentiality requirements; and other matters. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LONG TRM CARE REBALNC NOTE ACT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-30 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 49 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-06 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-25SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1032
2014-08-25SenateEffective Date August 25, 2014
2014-08-25SenateGovernor Approved
2014-06-27SenateSent to the Governor
2014-05-30SenatePassed Both Houses
2014-05-30SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 049-006-001
2014-05-27SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments
2014-05-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 28, 2014
2014-05-27SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2014-01-03SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b)
2014-01-03SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2013-11-06SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Criminal Law; 007-003-000
2013-11-06SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Criminal Law
2013-11-06SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2013-11-06SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Heather A. Steans
2013-11-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 7, 2013
2013-11-06SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2013-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2013-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis
2013-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2013-11-06HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000
2013-11-06House3/5 Vote Required
2013-11-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2013-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2013-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams
2013-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2013-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2013-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2013-11-06HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
2013-11-05HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2013-11-05HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2013-11-05HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2013-11-05HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000
2013-11-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote
2013-11-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
2013-11-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2013-11-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2013-10-30HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2013-10-30HouseAssigned to Judiciary
2013-10-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2013
2013-04-29HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2013-04-29HouseFirst Reading
2013-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2013-04-24HouseArrived in House
2013-04-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2013-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2013-04-23SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2013-04-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2013-04-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013
2013-04-18SenateSecond Reading
2013-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2013
2013-04-17SenateDo Pass as Amended Executive; 013-000-000
2013-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2013-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2013-04-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
2013-04-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2013-04-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2013-04-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Executive
2013-04-03SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013
2013-04-03SenateRe-assigned to Executive
2013-03-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2013-03-22SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2013-03-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2013-03-20SenatePostponed - Executive
2013-03-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2013-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2013-03-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans
2013-03-14SenateReported Back To Executive; 003-000-000
2013-03-06SenateTo Subcommittee on Governmental Operations
2013-03-05SenateAssigned to Executive
2013-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2013-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2013-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2352&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2352.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2352sam001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2352sam002.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2352eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2352ham001.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2352enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/98/098-1032.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/senate/09800SB2352_04232013_058000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/house/09800SB2352_11062013_010000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/98/senate/09800SB2352_05302014_021000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback