IL SB2352 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Employment Security for its FY 12 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2011.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$DES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08SenateSession Sine Die
2011-07-23SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2011-03-03SenateAssigned to Appropriations I
2011-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2011-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2011-02-15SenateChief Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan
2011-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback