IL SB2345 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on November 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1121
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning unfair labor practice procedures.
Title
SCHOOL REPORT CARD-SURVEY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-27 - House - Motion in House (Y: 75 N: 30 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-29 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1121 |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-11-27 | Senate | Both Houses Override Total Veto |
2018-11-27 | House | Override Governor Veto - House Passed 075-030-001 |
2018-11-27 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-27 | House | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-11-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-11-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Override Governor Veto - Senate Passed 053-000-000 |
2018-11-14 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Governor Veto Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-11-13 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto November 14, 2018 |
2018-08-19 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-026-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-08 | House | First Reading |
2018-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Lightford |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2018 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000 |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |