IL SB2344 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Sets forth provisions concerning the filing of premium rates with respect to health insurance coverage offered by a health insurance issuer and premium rate changes. Provides that in addition to filing premium rates, a company shall notify the Director of Insurance whenever a policy form has been closed for sale. Sets forth provisions concerning health insurance premium rates and prior approval of the Director. Contains provisions concerning appeal and requests for actuarial reasoning and data. Makes changes to the provision concerning group accident and health insurance. Amends the Health Maintenance Organization Act. Sets forth provisions concerning premium rates and filing and prior approval. Requires that the schedule of base rates for a group or individual contract or evidence of coverage to be used in conjunction with the contract or evidence of coverage be filed with the Director. Further amends the Act to comport with the provisions of the Illinois Insurance Code concerning health insurance premium rates and prior approval. Effective on January 1, 2014.
Title
INS-CD-PREMIUM RATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-assigned to Insurance |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Insurance Mandates and Special Issues |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 125 | 2-11.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 355.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |
215 | 5 | 367 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2344&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2344.htm |