IL SB2339 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Allows individuals to deduct an amount equal to the value of real estate donated during the taxable year to an entity exempt from federal taxation under Section 501(c) of the Internal Revenue Code. Requires the taxpayer to file with his or her return an appraisal substantiating the deduction that meets the requirements for appraisals acceptable to the Internal Revenue Service to substantiate the value of real estate for federal income tax purposes. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TAX-DEDUCT LAND DONATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | To Revenue Subcommittee on Special Issues | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Revenue | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Lauzen |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2339&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2339.htm |