IL SB2333 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-09-16 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that notwithstanding to the contrary, any provision of the Code, the Post-Conviction Hearing Article of the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963, or the Habeas Corpus Article or the relief from judgment provisions of the Code of Civil Procedure, a person serving a term of imprisonment, including a term of natural life, in a Department of Corrections institution or facility is eligible for earned discretionary reentry if he or she has served a term of imprisonment of at least 20 years. Provides that petitions for earned discretionary reentry shall be administered by the Prisoner Review Board. Establishes procedures for the hearing. Removes provision that no person serving a term of natural life imprisonment may be paroled or released except through executive clemency. Provides that if any incarcerated person is released on earned discretionary reentry, his or her sentence shall be considered complete after the term of mandatory supervised release. Applies retroactively. Contains a severability provision.
Title
CD CORR-RELEASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Celina Villanueva |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-3-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-3-3.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 3-5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |