IL SB2332 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-29 - Item Veto Stands 97-0725
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-29 - Item Veto Stands 97-0725
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Board of Trustees of Western Illinois University for its FY12 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2011.
Title
$WESTERN ILLINOIS UNIVERSITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-13 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-29 | Senate | Item Veto Stands 97-0725 |
2012-11-29 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2012 |
2012-11-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Item Veto November 27, 2012 |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Governor Item Veto PA 97-0725 |
2012-06-30 | Senate | Effective Date July 1, 2012 |
2012-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Appropriations I; 007-003-000 |
2012-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Appropriations I; 007-003-000 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Appropriations I |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Appropriations I |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2012-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-023-000 |
2012-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-05-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-05-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2012-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2012-04-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-07-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-05-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-05-16 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2011-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-05-16 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 034-022-000 |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Kotowski |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2011 |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 6, 2011 |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Do Pass Appropriations II; 007-002-000 |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan |