IL SB2324 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the powers and duties of the State Board of Education.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Local Government |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1A-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |