IL SB2321 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-25 - Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
Pending: Senate Cannabis Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Right to Privacy in the Workplace Act. Provides that an employer may not refuse to hire an individual or discipline an employee because results of an individual's drug test indicate the presence of THC on the part of that individual. Permits an employer to enforce a pre-employment drug testing policy, zero-tolerance drug testing policy, random drug testing policy, or a drug-free workplace policy or disciplining an employee for violating such policy, but provides that an employer may not take adverse action against an employee solely because of a positive drug test for cannabis unless the test result exceeds limits set forth in certain DUI provisions of the Illinois Vehicle Code. Sets forth conditions under which an employer may discipline an employee for impairment. Provides that there is not a cause of action for any person against an employer for disciplining or terminating the employment of an individual when enforcing a compliant policy. Amends the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Repeals provisions concerning employment and employer liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RIGHT TO PRIVACY-DRUG TEST

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 26, 2024
2024-05-24SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2024
2024-05-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 24, 2024
2024-05-03SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 17, 2024
2024-04-12SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
2024-04-05SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 3, 2024
2024-03-15SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 5, 2024
2024-02-08SenateTo Subcommittee on Cannabis
2024-01-10SenateRe-assigned to Executive
2023-03-10SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2023-03-09SenateTo Subcommittee on Cannabis
2023-02-28SenateAssigned to Executive
2023-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2023-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41070510-50Amended CodeCitation Text
820555Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback