IL SB2313 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0787
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0787
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Animal Control Act. Provides that ten dollars of the differential shall be placed either in a county animal population control fund (rather than or the State's Pet Population Control Fund). Provides that the dog's owner shall pay a $25 public safety fine to be deposited into the county animal control fund or the county pet population control fund (rather than $20 of which shall be deposited into the Pet Population Control Fund and $5 of which shall be retained by the county or municipality). Deletes language providing that an animal control agency shall assist and share information with the Director of Public Health in the collection of public safety fines. Provides that the owner of a biting animal must also remit a $25 public safety fine to be deposited into the county animal control fund (rather than to the Department of Public Health, for deposit into the Pet Population Control Fund). Provides that if a dog is found to be a vicious dog, the owner shall pay a $100 public safety fine to be deposited into the county animal control fund (rather than the Pet Population Control Fund). Provides that if a dog is deemed dangerous, a $50 public safety fine to be deposited into the county animal control fund (rather than the Pet Population Control Fund). Amends the Illinois Public Health and Safety Animal Population Control Act. Deletes language providing that the Director of Public Health must make an annual written report relative to the progress of the program to the President of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representatives, and the Governor. Makes changes to the definitions of "Director" and "Department". Effective immediately.
Title
ANIMALS-COUNTY ANIMAL FUNDS
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Holmes [D] | Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Andy Manar [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] |
Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0787 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-003-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-19 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2018 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Holmes |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 007-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
510 | 5 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 5 | 15.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 5 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 92 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
510 | 92 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |