IL SB2296 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-31 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act. Provides that, before commencing construction of a new establishment or an alteration or addition to an existing establishment, the owner or operator of the establishment shall submit architectural drawings and specifications for the construction, alteration, or addition to the Department of Public Health for review and approval. Contains requirements for submissions, review of submissions, and notice provided under the provisions. Provides fees based upon the estimated dollar value of constructions, alterations, or additions. Creates the Health Establishment Plan Review Fund and makes a conforming change in the State Finance Act. Requires fees collected under the provisions to be deposited into the Fund and used by the Department only to pay the costs of conducting reviews under the provisions. Contains other provisions.
Title
ASSISTED LIVING-FACILITY PLAN
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Health and Human Services |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Health and Human Services |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 9 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.990 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2296&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2296.htm |