IL SB2295 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0703
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fish and Aquatic Life Code. Defines "fishing license" for purposes of the Act as an electronic or physical license authorizing the person to take a certain type of fish during a specified period of time. Effective immediately.
Title
FISHING LICENSES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0703 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Effective Date August 3, 2018 |
2018-08-03 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 016-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 17, 2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Agriculture; 009-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |