IL SB2292 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-12-04 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that any member of the General Assembly sworn into office on and after the second Wednesday in January of 2019, and who retires a participating member under the General Assembly Retirement System, shall be responsible for exactly 50% of the applicable premiums, charges, or other fees for the basic program of group health benefits. Provides that, subject to a reduction based upon Medicare coverage, the State's contribution towards the basic program of group health benefits for such General Assembly members shall be exactly 50% of the applicable premiums, charges, or other fees owed. Provides that the provisions requiring 50% contribution for retired General Assembly member health benefits do not apply to any person who previously served as a member of the General Assembly in either house prior to the second Wednesday of January of 2019. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RETIRED GA-HEALTH INSURANCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady
2018-05-18HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-05-08HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-05-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-05-08HouseFirst Reading
2018-05-02HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-05-02HouseArrived in House
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-01SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2018-04-27SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2018
2018-04-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2018
2018-04-10SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-15SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-14SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-02-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-02-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-01-30SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-01-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-01-10SenateFirst Reading
2018-01-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
537510Amended CodeCitation Text
53759Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback