IL SB2289 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0923
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0923
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963, the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act, and the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986 by correcting cross references to Sections that have been repealed and by changing a county population threshold.
Title
IMDMA-UPDATE CROSS REFERENCES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0923 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-014-000 |
2018-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-05-16 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | House | To Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee |
2018-05-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2018 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 112A-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 504 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 5 | 505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
750 | 60 | 214 | Amended Code | Citation Text |