IL SB2289 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Township Code. Removes a restriction requiring townships to possess an equalized assessed valuation of not less than $10,000,000 or 126 square miles. Further provides that after a vote or ordinance has approved the consolidation of a township, a county board may establish a new tax for the consolidated township or consolidated township and municipality. Amends the Property Tax Code making conforming changes.
Title
CONSOLIDATE TWP-LIMITS-REVENUE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 To Subcommittee on Consolidation |
2016-04-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Consolidation |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 18-51 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 10-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 20-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 27-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 28-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |