IL SB2286 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Courses of Study Article of the School Code. Provides that a screening to determine risk of cardiac arrest shall be included in the required health examination.
Title
SCH CD-CARDIAC ARREST EXAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Ellman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-8.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2286&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB2286.htm |