IL SB2280 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that Act may be referred to as the Constitutional Right to Carry a Firearm Act. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Allows a person 21 or older to carry on his or her person, openly or concealed, a firearm and firearm ammunition, unless otherwise prohibited. Allows a person 18 to 20 years of age to carry on his or her person, openly or concealed, a firearm and firearm ammunition if a member or honorably discharged veteran of the United States Armed Forces, unless otherwise prohibited. Prohibits the following persons from possessing or carrying a firearm and firearm ammunition: (1) convicted of a felony or if under 21 certain misdemeanors; (2) convicted of misdemeanor domestic violence; (3) fugitive from justice; (4) unlawful user or addicted to any controlled substance; (5) intellectually disabled, adjudicated as a mental defective, or been committed to a mental institution; (6) illegally in the United States or admitted to the United States under a nonimmigrant visa but provides exceptions; (7) has renounced United States citizenship; (10) dishonorably discharged from the Armed Forces; or (11) subject to a court restraining order from harassing, stalking, or threatening an intimate partner, child of the intimate partner, or person, or engaging in conduct that would place an these persons in reasonable fear of bodily injury. Repeals the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act and unlawful possession of a firearm and firearm ammunition. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD FIREARM CARRY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013 |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2013 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Firearms |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2280&GAID=12&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/SB/09800SB2280.htm |