IL SB2275 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that a parole agent or parole supervisor must receive training in the use of firearms initially at the Illinois Department of Corrections Parole Academy and be certified as having successfully completing the training by the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board upon graduation of parole training at the Academy. Thereafter, the parole agent or supervisor must successfully complete firearms training required for his or her position with the Department of Corrections. Eliminates provision that the training shall be taken while off-duty. Eliminates requirement that the agent or supervisor must register the firearm with the Department of State Police and with any other local law enforcement agency that requires registration. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-PAROLE AGENT-TRAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 8, 2011 |
2011-03-15 | Senate | To Public Health Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2011-03-08 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Millner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-14-1.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |