IL SB2267 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that no one may be licensed to teach or supervise in the public schools of this State who has been convicted of certain drug offenses until 7 years following the end of the sentence for the offense. Makes changes to provisions relating to the conviction of certain offenses as grounds for revocation of an educator license, including changing the definitions of terms, providing for disqualification for licensure, and providing that suspension of a license or denial of an application for a license of a person who has been convicted of certain drug offenses shall last until 7 years following the end of the sentence for the offense. Makes technical corrections in provisions requiring a criminal history records check to be performed with regard to applicants for employment with a school district. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-EDUCATOR QUALIFICATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-21.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21B-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2267&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2267.htm |