IL SB2265 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-3)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of State Police Law. Requires the Department of State Police to compile and maintain an historic data repository relating to, among other missing persons, lost or missing individuals with developmental or intellectual disabilities, in order to develop and improve techniques utilized by law enforcement agencies when responding to reports of missing persons. Provides that the Department of State Police, in coordination with the Illinois Department of Human Services, shall develop and implement a community outreach program to promote awareness of the Endangered Missing Person Advisory among applicable entities, including, but is not limited to developmental disability facilities. Amends the Missing Persons Identification Act. Provides that a "high-risk missing person" under the Act includes evidence that a person is at risk because he or she is a person having a developmental disability or a person having an intellectual disability. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MISSING PERSON WITH DISABILITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15SenateSent to the Governor
2018-05-18SenatePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Halbrook
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-05-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 004-000-000
2018-05-02HouseAssigned to Special Needs Services
2018-04-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseFirst Reading
2018-04-24HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-24HouseArrived in House
2018-04-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateSecond Reading
2018-02-21SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2018-02-21SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 22, 2018
2018-02-21SenateDo Pass as Amended Human Services; 008-000-000
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-02-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-01-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-01-30SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-01-24SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-11-08SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-11-08SenateFirst Reading
2017-11-08SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026052605-375Amended CodeCitation Text
2026052605-485Amended CodeCitation Text
20260555a in partAmended CodeCitation Text
5072210Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback