IL SB2264 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code and the Interscholastic Athletic Organization Act. Provides that provisions allowing part-time attendance in the regular education program of a school district by pupils enrolled in nonpublic schools shall include allowing resident pupils who are enrolled in nonpublic schools to participate in those school-sponsored or school-supported athletic or extracurricular activities that are not selective with respect to who may join or participate. Requires an association or other entity that has as one of its purposes promoting, sponsoring, regulating, or in any manner providing for interscholastic athletics or any form of athletic competition among elementary or secondary schools and students within this State to report, on or before July 1, 2016, to the General Assembly on the association's or entity's efforts to communicate its rules to public and nonpublic schools in this State. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-EXTRACURRICULAR ACTIV
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Education |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 015-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 25 | 1.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 10-20.24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |