IL SB2243 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $17,129,100 from the General Revenue Fund to the State Board of Elections for operational expenses, grants, reimbursements, and the Census 2020 Redistricting Program for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020. Appropriates various amounts from the Personal Property Tax Replacement Fund to the State Board of Elections for its ordinary and contingent expenses. Reappropriates amounts from the Help Illinois Vote Fund to the State Board of Elections for implementation of the Help America Vote Act of 2002. Effective July 1, 2019.
Title
$ST BD ELECTIONS-OCE
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2243&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/PDF/10100SB2243.pdf |