IL SB2241 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the No Taxpayer Funding for Abortion Act. Provides that neither the State nor any of its subdivisions may authorize the use of, appropriate, or expend funds to pay for an abortion or to cover any part of the costs of a health plan that includes coverage of abortion or to provide or refer for an abortion, unless a woman who suffers from a physical disorder, physical injury, or physical illness that would, as certified by a physician, place the woman in danger of death if an abortion is not performed. Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971 and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Excludes from the programs of health benefits and services authorized under those Acts coverage for elective abortions as provided in the No Taxpayer Funding for Abortion Act. Prohibits a physician who has been found guilty of performing an abortion procedure in a willful and wanton manner upon a woman who was not pregnant when the abortion procedure was performed from participating in the State's Medical Assistance Program. Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall require a written statement, including the required opinion of a physician, to accompany a claim for reimbursement for abortions or induced miscarriages or premature births. Makes other changes. Amends the Problem Pregnancy Health Services and Care Act. Permits the Department of Human Services to make grants to nonprofit agencies and organizations that do not use those grants to refer or counsel for, or perform, abortions. Contains provisions regarding applicability and preempts home rule. Effective on the earlier of the effective date of Public Act 100-538 or June 1, 2018.
Title
NO TAXPAYER FUNDING ABORTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-01-30 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kyle McCarter |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Tom Rooney |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-10-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-10-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 6-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 230 | 4-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2241&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2241.htm |