IL SB2229 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on August 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0314
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Higher Education Student Assistance Act in the provision concerning the Illinois National Guard and Naval Militia grant program. Provides that beginning with the 2013-2014 academic year, any person who has served over 10 years in the Illinois National Guard shall be awarded an additional grant to the State-controlled university or community college of his or her choice, consisting of an exemption from tuition and fees for not more than the equivalent of an additional 2 years of full-time enrollment, including summer terms. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGHER ED-NATIONAL GUARD GRANT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-12 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0314 |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Effective Date August 12, 2013 |
2013-08-12 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-21 | House | Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2013-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-008-002 |
2013-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-05-13 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2013-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2013-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-05-07 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-05-01 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2013-04-24 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2013-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 947 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |