IL SB2217 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Early Intervention Services System Act. Adds nursing services, nutrition services, and sign language and cued language services to the list of services included in the definition of "early intervention services". Provides that before adopting any new policy or procedure needed to comply with certain provisions under the Individuals with Disabilities Education Act, the Department of Human Services must hold public hearings on the new policy or procedure, provide notice of the hearings at least 30 days before the hearings are conducted, and provide an opportunity for the general public, including individuals with disabilities and parents of infants and toddlers with disabilities, early intervention providers, and other specified persons to comment for at least 30 days on the new policy or procedure. Provides that the statewide system for early intervention services and programs shall include a central directory which includes public and private early intervention services (rather than early intervention services), resources, and experts available in this State, professional and other groups that provide assistance to infants and toddlers with disabilities and their families, and research and demonstration projects being conducted in this State (rather than early intervention research and demonstration projects) relating to infants and toddlers with disabilities. Makes changes to provisions concerning criminal background checks; the timeline for the initial evaluation and assessment of a child and his or her family under the individualized family service plan; and other matters. Repeals a provision requiring the Early Intervention Legislative Advisory Committee to convene for a period of 4 years no later than 60 days after August 9, 2001. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-EARLY INTERVENTION SERVICE
Sponsors
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Ira Silverstein [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] |
Sen. Steve Stadelman [D] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-05-01 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2013-05-01 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2013-04-11 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-011-000 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 13, 2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-001 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 20 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 13.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 13.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 13.30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 13.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 13.50 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
325 | 20 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |