IL SB2205 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Finance Authority Act. Authorizes the Illinois Finance Authority to issue bonds if the amount of accelerated pension benefit payments exceeds the amount appropriated to each pension system for those payments. Amends the General Obligation Bond Act. Authorizes the issuance of an additional $7,000,000,000 in State General Obligation Restructuring Bonds. Provides that the proceeds from that bond sale shall be used for the purpose of paying vouchers incurred by the State prior to July 1, 2017. Authorizes $250,000,000 in State Pension Obligation Acceleration Bonds to be sold to pay for accelerated pension benefit payments to eligible persons. Amends the State Pension Funds Continuing Appropriation Act to create a continuing appropriation for payments on those Bonds. Amends the State Finance Act. Provides that, if State spending exceeds $31,374,000,000, then no member of the General Assembly shall receive any compensation for his or her service as a member of the General Assembly, including any salary, stipend, or per diem, for the remainder of the fiscal year or until such time as the Governor is presented with a bill or bills passed by the General Assembly to reduce State spending to a level that does not exceed the State spending limitation. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-BONDS-SPENDING LIMIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3501 | 801-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 14.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.878 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 330 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 2.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 330 | 7.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 330 | 7.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 330 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 15 | 1.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2205&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2205.htm |