IL SB2201 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code, Township Code, and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a zoning ordinance or other zoning regulation may not prohibit or restrict the erection of an industrialized residential structure or a manufactured home on real property, provided that: (1) an industrialized residential structure or manufactured home is compatible with the character of a respective district; (2) regulations impose the same aesthetic compatibility requirements on an industrialized residential structure or manufactured home that are applicable to all residential structures in the respective district; and (3) an industrialized residential structure or manufactured home meets applicable standards for the exterior design of buildings and structures. Limits home rule powers.
Title
LOCAL-INDUST RESIDENTIAL BLDGS
Sponsors
Sen. Elgie Sims [D] | Rep. Lindsey LaPointe [D] | Rep. Delia Ramirez [D] | Rep. Nicholas Smith [D] |
Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Maurice West [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 009-002-000 |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-014-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-12022 | New Code | See Bill Text |
60 | 1 | 110-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-12-6.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-13-28 | New Code | See Bill Text |