IL SB2182 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2)
Status: Failed on January 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-12 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $7,537,500 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Human Services for a grant to the Illinois Food Bank Association (Feeding Illinois) to operate the Food for Families Program. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$HUMAN SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-12 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-07 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2009-04-03 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-03-17 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Appropriations I | |
2009-02-27 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs | |
2009-02-27 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale E. Risinger | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2009-02-25 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Deanna Demuzio | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2182&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/PDF/09600SB2182.pdf |