IL SB2175 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0376
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0376
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Innovation and Technology Act. Modifies provisions concerning the powers and duties of the Department of Innovation and Technology and its Secretary. Provides purpose provisions. Modifies definitions. Makes conforming and other changes in the Department of Innovation and Technology Act and the State Finance Act.
Title
DEPT OF INNOVATION AND TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0376 |
2021-08-13 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-13 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-06 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-05-05 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 14, 2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1370 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-20 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-30 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-50 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-55 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1370 | 1-60 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6p-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 8.16a | Amended Code | Citation Text |