IL SB2153 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0426
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, and removes: (1) a provision specifying that a request for information process need not be used in procuring a renewal or extension of a lease if, among other requirements, the Procurement Policy Board does not object in writing to the renewal or extension within 14 (currently, 30) calendar days after its submission; and (2) a provision specifying that upon receipt of (i) any proposed lease of real property of 10,000 or more square feet; or (ii) any proposed lease of real property with annual rent payments of $100,000 or more, the Procurement Policy Board shall have 14 (currently, 30) calendar days to review the proposed lease. Makes conforming changes.
Title
PROCUREMENT-LEASES & RENEWALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 88 N: 22 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0426 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 088-022-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2019-05-14 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-14 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government; 007-000-000 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Heather A. Steans |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 40-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 40-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 40-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |