IL SB2149 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a credit for taxpayers who (1) have an adjusted gross income of $200,000 or less and (2) are college or university students or may claim a college or university student as a dependent. Provides that the credit shall be equal to a portion of the tuition and fee expenses paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year on behalf of the qualifying student. Sets forth the amount of the credit. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-EDUCATION CREDIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2149&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2149.htm |