IL SB2147 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-01 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Healthy Workplace Act and amends the State Finance Act. Requires employers to provide specified paid sick days to employees. Sets forth the purposes for and manner in which the sick days may be used. Contains provisions regarding employer responsibilities, unlawful employer practices, and other matters. Provides that the Department of Labor shall administer the Act. Authorizes the imposition of civil penalties. Authorizes individuals to file civil actions with respect to violations. Creates the Healthy Workplace Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Effective immediately.
Title
HEALTHY WORKPLACE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-11-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2016 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 27, 2016 |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 13, 2016 |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 7, 2016 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-004-000 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-06-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-05-31 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2147&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2147.htm |