IL SB2140 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Kyoto Protocol Act of 1998. Makes a technical change in a Section on State rules.
Title
KYOTO PROTOCOL OF 1998
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Ann Gillespie [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] | Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-06-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2020-02-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2020-01-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-01-28 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2019-06-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2019 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 016-007-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2019-05-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-005-000 |
2019-05-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2019-05-16 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-016-000 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 26, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 007-001-000 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 140 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |