IL SB2138 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0889
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0889
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Snow Removal Service Liability Limitation Act. Provides that any provision in a snow plow and de-icing services contract that purports to indemnify or hold harmless a promisee from or against liability for loss or damage resulting from the negligence or omissions of the promisee is against the public policy of this State and is void and unenforceable. Effective immediately.
Title
SNOW REMOVAL LIABILITY LIMITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0889 |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date August 25, 2016 |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Judiciary; 010-000-000 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2016-05-26 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Judiciary |
2016-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-25 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 26, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2016-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 |
2016-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-05-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-05-13 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2016 |
2016-05-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-05-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-05-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-22 | House | First Reading |
2016-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted; Nybo |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 9, 2016 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 3, 2016 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |