IL SB2136 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0575
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0575
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the North Shore Water Reclamation District Act. Provides that connection fees owed at the time of a property's sale shall be a lien on real estate. Provides that if the district participates in a nutrient trading program, the district shall give preference to trading investments: (i) that will benefit low income or rural communities; and (ii) where local water quality improvements can be realized. Increases the maximum dollar amount of an emergency contract to no more than $500,000 (rather than $350,000). Provides that if the board of trustees determine there is an emergency affecting the public health or safety, the district may immediately acquire the necessary right-of-way and authority to work within or adjacent to a public highway right-of-way or easement, public or private utility property or easement, railroad right-of-way, or other public property or easement. Effective immediately.
Title
NORTH SHORE WATER RECLAMATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 36 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 60 N: 53 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0575 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2019 |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2019-05-31 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 036-019-000 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Local Government; 005-001-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Local Government |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Terry Link |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 - May 24, 2019 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 2 |
2019-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 060-053-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2019-05-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 011-003-000 |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-09 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-02 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 27, 2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 2305 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2305 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2305 | 7.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 2305 | 7.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |