IL SB2134 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-22 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that each person applying at a driver services facility for a driver's license or permit, a corrected driver's license or permit, an Illinois identification card or a corrected Illinois identification card shall be notified that the person shall be registered (rather than may apply to register) to vote, and if his or her address has changed, his or her voter registration information shall be updated (rather than may be transferred upon application) to the new address within this State. Provides that the person may decline to register to vote and the employee or the Secretary of State shall not transmit the person's information to the applicable election authority.
Title
VEH CD-VOTER REGISTRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 22, 2016 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2015-10-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2015-10-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-10-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2015-10-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-09-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-05-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 2-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2134&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2134.htm |