IL SB2089 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Election Code. Includes certain tax-exempt organizations under the federal Internal Revenue Code in the definitions of political action committees, ballot initiative committees, and independent expenditure committees. Allows the tax-exempt organizations to establish a separate political committee whose function is to receive or make contributions, make expenditures, or any combination thereof, to support or oppose candidates or questions of public policy. Sets forth certain requirements for these separate committees. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ELEC CD-TAX-EXEMPT NONPROFITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-16SenateDo Pass Executive; 011-003-000
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
2017-03-09SenatePostponed - Executive
2017-03-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-03-01SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Executive
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1059-1.8Amended CodeCitation Text
1059-6Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback