IL SB2084 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Reduces the filing fees for a limited liability company filing articles of organization (domestic), application for admission (foreign), restated articles of organization (domestic), or an application for reinstatement (foreign or domestic) with the Secretary of State from $500 to $250. Effective immediately.
Title
LLC-SOS-ARTICLES FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-27 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-05-20 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 27, 2011 |
2011-05-13 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2011-05-04 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael Unes |
2011-04-25 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2011-04-15 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-04-15 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2011-04-15 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2011-04-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2011-04-14 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2011-04-08 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Shane Cultra |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Duffy |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2011 |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carole Pankau |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
805 | 180 | 50-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |