IL SB2077 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Fire and Smoke Damper Inspection Act. Requires inspections and testing of HVAC fire dampers and smoke dampers to be conducted by individuals certified by the International Certification Board and Accredited to comply with specified requirements. Provides that (1) fire damper and smoke damper inspections and testing shall be conducted by inspectors certified by the International Certification Board and accredited by specified entities and (2) inspectors shall certify that all fire and smoke dampers inspected meet the standards established in the current International Fire Code adopted by the State of Illinois and the authority having jurisdiction.
Title
FIRE & SMOKE DAMPER INSPECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |