IL SB2072 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that an Electing Provider that has at any time been subject to a certain condition of a specified order issued by the Illinois Commerce Commission shall be subject to specified provisions of the Illinois Administrative Code. Extends the repeal date of the Telecommunications Article to July 1, 2020.
Title
UTILITY-MARKET REGULATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass Telecommunications and Information Technology; 011-000-000 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 13-1200 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 13-506.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |