IL SB2055 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the Illinois Commerce Commission for its FY 16 ordinary and contingent expenses.
Title
$ILLINOIS COMMERCE COMMISSION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-06-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-10-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading July 15, 2015 |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |