IL SB2054 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Permits offenders subject to the truth in sentencing provisions of the Code to earn sentence credit for good conduct in specific instances as the Director of Corrections deems proper. Permits offenders subject to the truth in sentencing provisions of the Code to earn sentence credit for educational, vocational, substance abuse, behavior modification programs, life skills courses, re-entry planning, and correctional industry programs. Provides that sentence credit earned shall not reduce the sentence of the prisoner to less than: (1) 75% (rather than 85%) of his or her sentence if the prisoner is required to serve 85% of his or her sentence; and (2) 90% of his or her sentence if the prisoner is required to serve 100% of his or her sentence. Makes conforming changes.
Title
CD CORR-SENTENCE CREDIT
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Chuck Weaver [R] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] |
Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Criminal Law |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Criminal Law |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 28, 2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-6-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |