IL SB2048 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
Hearing: May 30 @ 9:00 am in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Private Detective, Private Alarm, Private Security, Fingerprint Vendor, and Locksmith Act of 2004. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall issue a firearm control card to an elected or appointed State's Attorney or the State's Attorney's designated assistant who has passed an approved firearm training course, has met all the requirements of the Act, and possesses a valid firearm owner identification card. Provides that the circuit or associate judge of each county may be issued a firearm control card by the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation if appropriate training and requirements are met in the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARM CARD-STATE'S ATTORNEYS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-05-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-05-09HouseFirst Reading
2017-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2017-05-04HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-03-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017
2017-03-15SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000
2017-03-14SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-03-14SenateReported Back To Judiciary; 003-000-000
2017-03-08SenateTo Subcommittee on Firearms
2017-03-07SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22544735-35Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback