IL SB2034 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that for the purposes of the offense of threatening a public official or human service provider, "public official" includes a social worker, caseworker, attorney, or investigator employed by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, the Department of Human Services, the Department of Children and Family Services, or the Guardianship and Advocacy Commission; or an assistant public guardian, attorney, social worker, case manager, or investigator employed by a duly appointed public guardian.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BAIL REFORM ACT/CRIM CD-THREAT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 27 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-06-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0001
2017-06-09SenateEffective Date January 1, 2018; Some provisions
2017-06-09SenateEffective Date June 9, 2017; Some provisions
2017-06-09SenateGovernor Approved
2017-06-05SenateSent to the Governor
2017-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2017-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 055-000-000
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-31SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Executive
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2017-05-31SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2017-05-30SenateHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 31, 2017
2017-05-30SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2
2017-05-30HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-027-004
2017-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-30HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-30HouseAlternate Chief Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-30HouseAlternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-05-30HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-05-30SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 009-002-000
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-29HouseAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-16HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2017-05-09HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2017-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-28HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-28HouseArrived in House
2017-04-27SenateThird Reading - Passed; 050-000-000
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 9, 2017
2017-03-08SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2017-02-10SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-10SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-10SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Ira I. Silverstein

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-9Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2034&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2034.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2034eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2034enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2034ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB2034ham002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2034_04272017_082000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000SB2034_05302017_051000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2034_05312017_103001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000SB2034_05312017_103000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback